Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Grimes

Deceased

Bishop of Syracuse, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1852BornBrooklawn, Ireland
19 Feb 188229.2Ordained PriestPriest of Syracuse, New York, USA
1 Feb 190956.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
1 Feb 190956.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Himeria
16 May 190956.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Himeria
6 Aug 191259.6SucceededBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
26 Jul 192269.6DiedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Grimes:
Bishop John Grimes (born , died ) Bishop of Syracuse

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013