Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Cardinal McCloskey

Deceased

Archbishop of New York, New York

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1810BornBrooklyn
12 Jan 183423.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
21 Nov 184333.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of New York, New York, USA
21 Nov 184333.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
10 Mar 184434.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
21 May 184737.2AppointedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
6 May 186454.2AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
15 Mar 187565.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 187565.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
10 Oct 188575.6DiedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John McCloskey:
Cardinal John McCloskey (born , died ) Archbishop of New York

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 85, and Page 407
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 101, and Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013