Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Francis Hendricken

Deceased

Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1827Born
25 Apr 185325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
16 Feb 187244.7AppointedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
28 Apr 187244.9Ordained BishopBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
11 Jun 188659.0DiedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Hendricken (VIAF: 68473747)
Bishop Thomas Francis Hendricken (born , died ) Bishop of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017