Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Baltimore

Archidioecesis Baltimorensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • William Edward Lori, Archbishop
  • Denis James Madden, Auxiliary Bishop
  • William Henry Keeler, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • William Clifford Newman, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 15 November 1947
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Maryland
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 12,430 (4,801 Square Miles)
  • Description: Allegany, Anne Arundel, Baltimore, Carroll, Frederick, Garrett, Harford, Howard, and Washington Counties and the City of Baltimore.
  • Conference Region: IV (DC, DE, MD, VA, VI, WV)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: BAL
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archbalt.org/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Center, 320 Cathedral Street, Baltimore, MD 21201, USA
  • Telephone: (410)547-5437
  • Fax: 727-8234

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of United States of America
26 November 1784ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of United States of America (erected)
Diocese of Baltimore
6 November 1789ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of United States of America (Name Changed and Prelature raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Baltimore (erected)
8 April 1808Territory LostDiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Boston (erected) (Massachusets, Maine, New Hampshire, Rhode Island, Connecticut, and Vermont)
8 April 1808Territory LostDiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Bardstown (erected)
8 April 1808Territory LostDiocese of Baltimore Diocese of New York (erected) (State of New York plus Sussex, Bergen, Morris, Essex, Somerset, Middlesex, and Monmouth counties in New Jersey)
8 April 1808Territory LostDiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Philadelphia (erected) (Pennsylvania, Delaware, and 7 counties of New Jersey)
Archdiocese of Baltimore
8 April 1808ElevatedDiocese of Baltimore Archdiocese of Baltimore
11 July 1820Territory LostArchdiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Charleston (erected)
11 July 1820Territory LostArchdiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Richmond (erected)
15 August 1858Territory LostArchdiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Richmond (Alexandria)
3 March 1868Territory LostArchdiocese of Baltimore
Diocese of Philadelphia
Diocese of Wilmington (erected)
Archdiocese of Baltimore-Washington
22 July 1939Name ChangedArchdiocese of Baltimore Archdiocese of Baltimore-Washington
Archdiocese of Baltimore
15 November 1947SplitArchdiocese of Baltimore-Washington Archdiocese of Baltimore
Archdiocese of Washington (District of Columbia plus Montgomery, Prince George, St. Mary's, Calvert, and Charles Counties in the State of Maryland)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of United States of America
Diocese of Baltimore
Archdiocese of Baltimore
Archdiocese of Baltimore-Washington
Archdiocese of Baltimore
1950297,5461,509,68419.7%2683816494585292,460118ap1951
1959403,5052,509,13916.1%2883876755978142,759131ap1960
1964480,6532,116,85922.7%3173816986888533,411138ap1967
1970438,2032,321,05018.9%35832868663814962,937139ap1971
1976455,5642,425,53018.8%355417772590525592,120148ap1977
1980413,6682,869,43014.4%347320667620914781,972149ap1981
1990449,4832,534,00017.7%2863666526891744711,484162ap1991
1999484,2872,849,40917.0%304291595813187801,212155ap2000
2000486,6072,870,15017.0%2933045978151813801,233164ap2001
2001486,8282,903,89216.8%2582535119521673251,160162ap2002
2002497,4242,944,40716.9%2542605149671593331,190162ap2003
2003500,1792,972,08316.8%2632344971,0061713151,131154ap2004
2004506,5873,006,60716.8%3092655748821833381,088152ap2005
2006517,6793,055,40716.9%2852605459491783331,047151ap2007
2010499,5293,119,00016.0%297246543919158315934153ap2011
2012510,3283,148,69016.2%284227511998168296860146ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jun 2014