Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael William Hyle

Deceased

Bishop of Wilmington, Delaware


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1901BornBaltimore
12 Mar 192725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Jul 195856.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
3 Jul 195856.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
24 Sep 195856.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
2 Mar 196058.4SucceededBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
26 Dec 196766.2DiedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael William Hyle:
Bishop Michael William Hyle (born , died ) Bishop of Wilmington

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013