Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Chicago

Archidioecesis Chicagiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Blase Joseph Cupich, Archbishop
  • Francis Joseph Kane, Auxiliary Bishop
  • John Raymond Manz, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Joseph Nathaniel Perry, Auxiliary Bishop
  • George James Rassas, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Alberto Rojas, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Andrew Peter Wypych, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Francis Eugene George, O.M.I., Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Raymond Emil Goedert, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • John Robert Gorman, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 September 1880
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Illinois
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 3,654 (1,411 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the Counties of Cook and Lake in the State of Illinois.
  • Conference Region: VII (IL, IN, WI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: CHI
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archchicago.org/
  • Mailing Address: 835 Rush Street, Chicago, IL 60611-2030; P.O. Box 1979, Chicago, IL 60690-1979
  • Telephone: (312)534-8200
  • Fax: 534-6379

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chicago
28 November 1843ErectedDiocese of Saint Louis
Diocese of Vincennes
Diocese of Chicago (erected) (State of Illinois)
29 July 1853Territory LostDiocese of Chicago Diocese of Quincy (erected)
12 February 1875Territory LostDiocese of Chicago Diocese of Peoria (erected)
Archdiocese of Chicago
10 September 1880ElevatedDiocese of Chicago Archdiocese of Chicago
27 September 1908Territory LostArchdiocese of Chicago Diocese of Rockford (erected)
11 December 1948Territory LostArchdiocese of Chicago
Diocese of Peoria
Diocese of Rockford
Diocese of Joliet in Illinois (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Chicago
19501,706,0004,276,00039.9%1,1999942,193777994387393ap1951
19592,027,2434,687,88943.2%1,2401,4622,7027501,8678,603439ap1960
19662,340,0005,717,80040.9%1,3441,5822,9267992,2319,606453ap1967
19702,424,5915,757,00042.1%1,5491,1352,6849031,4608,331461ap1971
19762,420,9505,936,20040.8%1,3131,1362,4499882281,6895,847452ap1977
19802,406,7285,750,40541.9%1,2131,1502,3631,0184001,7405,040449ap1981
19902,350,0005,779,00040.7%1,1969772,1731,0815371,5424,561416ap1991
19992,358,0005,682,00041.5%9287991,7271,3656123663,176378ap2000
20002,384,0005,676,00042.0%9088001,7081,3956111,3163,223378ap2001
20012,394,0005,803,00041.3%8768171,6931,4146181,3333,340378ap2002
20022,442,0006,052,00040.4%8709181,7881,3656211,4232,967378ap2003
20036,047,000.0%8518861,73706241,4102,806374ap2004*
20042,442,0006,104,00040.0%9448371,7811,3716321,3352,618373ap2005
20062,348,0006,021,00039.0%8957871,6821,3956321,2722,397366ap2007
20092,364,0006,062,00039.0%9097891,6981,3926461,1862,067359ap2010
20102,383,0006,111,00039.0%9057871,6921,4086431,1621,966357ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Sep 2014