Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John George Vlazny

Archbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1937 BornChicago
20 Dec 196124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Oct 198346.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Oct 198346.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Stagnum
13 Dec 198346.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stagnum
19 May 198750.2AppointedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
29 Jul 198750.4InstalledBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
28 Oct 199760.7AppointedArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
19 Dec 199760.8InstalledArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
29 Jan 201375.9RetiredArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for John George Vlazny:
Archbishop John George Vlazny (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Apr 2014