Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nevin William Hayes, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Nova Sinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1922BornChicago
8 Jun 194624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
10 Jan 195936.9AppointedPrelate of Sicuani, Peru
5 May 196543.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
5 Aug 196543.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
7 Nov 197048.7ResignedPrelate of Sicuani, Peru
2 Feb 197149.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
12 Jul 198866.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Nevin William Hayes:
Bishop Nevin William Hayes O. Carm. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 25 Sep 2013