Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Joseph Flanagan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Worcester, Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1908BornProctor, VT
8 Dec 193123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Burlington, Vermont, USA
1 Sep 195345.4AppointedBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
30 Nov 195345.7Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
8 Aug 195951.4AppointedBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
24 Sep 195951.5InstalledBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
31 Mar 198375.0RetiredBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
28 Jan 199889.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Joseph Flanagan:
Bishop Bernard Joseph Flanagan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Worcester

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013