Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Cornelius O’Leary

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Portland, Maine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1920BornBangor
15 Jun 194625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Portland, Maine, USA
16 Nov 197050.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA
16 Nov 197050.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Moglaena
25 Jan 197150.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Moglaena
16 Oct 197454.2AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
18 Dec 197454.3InstalledBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
27 Sep 198868.1RetiredBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
2 Apr 200281.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Cornelius O’Leary:
Bishop Edward Cornelius O’Leary (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Portland

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013