Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulius Antanas Baltakis, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Egara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1925Born
1946²21.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Sep 195025.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
24 Aug 195227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Jun 198459.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Egara
14 Sep 198459.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egara
17 May 201994.3DiedTitular Bishop of Egara

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paulius Antanas Baltakis (VIAF: 1585154260596824480002)
Bishop Paulius Antanas Baltakis O.F.M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Egara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroškunai, Lithuania
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Portland, ME, Diocese of Portland, Maine, USA
Death PlaceKaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas, Lithuania
Buried Place (Original)Old City, Cemetery, Kretinga

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • prof/loc: CB, 10 Jan 2019
  • d: CB, 18 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 18 May 2019

Quantcast