Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincentas Brizgys

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kaunas

Titular Bishop of Bosana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1903BornPlynisi
5 Jun 192723.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 194036.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
2 Apr 194036.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bosana
19 May 194036.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bosana
23 Apr 199288.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Vincentas Brizgys:
Bishop Vincentas Brizgys (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kaunas

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 51.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013