Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mečislovas Reinys

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Archbishop of Cypsela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1884BornMadagaskaras
10 Jun 190723.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 192642.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
5 Apr 192642.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiddi
16 May 192642.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiddi
18 Jul 194056.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Vilnius, Lithuania
18 Jul 194056.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cypsela
8 Nov 195369.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Mečislovas Reinys:
Archbishop Mečislovas Reinys (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,372
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 30
  • c2+: CB, 6 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013