Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wincenty Kluczynski

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mohilev

Titular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1847BornSzarkowsczyna
30 Sep 187124.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 191062.5AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
29 May 191062.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
22 Sep 191466.9ResignedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
22 Sep 191466.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
23 Feb 191769.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Kluczynski:
Archbishop Wincenty Kluczynski (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mohilev

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015