Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Józef Ryx

Deceased

Bishop of Sandomierz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1853BornWarszawa
20 Jul 187925.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 191056.3AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
19 Jun 191056.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
1 Jun 193076.4DiedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marian Józef Ryx:
Bishop Marian Józef Ryx (born , died ) Bishop of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015