Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Franciszek Kubicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz

Titular Bishop of Canatha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1871BornRadom
16 Jul 189322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz, Poland
29 Jul 191847.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
29 Jul 191847.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
1 Dec 191847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
11 Feb 194473.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Paweł Franciszek Kubicki:
Bishop Paweł Franciszek Kubicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013