Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Mikołaj Stanisław Kostka Młodziejewski

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1717Born
2 Jul 174022.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jul 174022.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 176648.9SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1 Dec 176649.0ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
2 Feb 176749.1Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
5 Mar 176850.2SelectedBishop of Poznań, Poland
16 May 176850.4ConfirmedBishop of Poznań, Poland
20 Feb 178062.2DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Mikołaj Stanisław Kostka Młodziejewski
Bishop Andrzej Mikołaj Stanisław Kostka Młodziejewski (born , died ) Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoszizonowicz

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 346, and Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast