Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Gembicki

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1585Born
1614²28.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 163650.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
22 Feb 163751.3Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
10 Nov 164257.0AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
14 Jul 165771.7DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr Gembicki (VIAF: 102254404)
Bishop Piotr Gembicki (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGniezno

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 167, and Page 288
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast