Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Trzebiński

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Feb 1636Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 1642AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
15 Mar 1643Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
25 Jul 1644DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Trzebiński
Bishop Aleksander Trzebiński (died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrzenda

  • a priest for 8.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,941
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018