Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Gembicki

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹Born
21 Apr 165351.3AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
Aug 1653³51.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Sep 165351.6InstalledBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
11 Oct 165553.7AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
12 Mar 167472.1AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
Mar 167573.1DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Gembicki:
Bishop Jan Gembicki , Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 169, and Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1653, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015