Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni de Torres

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornRoma
30 Jan 164540.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
19 Feb 164540.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
1 May 164540.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
21 Sep 165247.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1 Apr 165853.2AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
Sep 1662³57.6DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Torres (VIAF: 311321684)
Archbishop Giovanni de Torres (born 1605, died Sep 1662) Archbishop of Salerno

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68, and Page 301
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 109, Number 664
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1645, Number 7
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 290
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016