Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Annibale Bentivoglio

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thebae


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1645AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
19 Mar 1645Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
20 Apr 1645AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Nov 1652³ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
21 Apr 1663DiedTitular Archbishop of Thebae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annibale Bentivoglio
Archbishop Annibale Bentivoglio (died ) Titular Archbishop of Thebae

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 332
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 109, Number 666
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 13
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 254
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016