Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Gonzaga

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1588Born
17 Mar 162132.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
18 Apr 162132.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
23 Mar 164960.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Gonzaga (VIAF: 18329458)
Archbishop Alfonso Gonzaga (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Rhodus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovellara, Italy
Ordained BishopGes¨, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceReggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia, Italy

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1621, Number 50
  • ob/c2: AT, 7 Aug 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,979

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017