Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Tomati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bitetto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹BornCaravonica
16 Dec 164150.9AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
22 Dec 164150.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bitetto, Italy
1655¹64.0ResignedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
24 Jan 166574.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Bitetto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Tomati:
Bishop Marco Antonio Tomati (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bitetto

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 106, Number 642
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015