Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Melzi

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹Born
21 Sep 165960.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 165960.7AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
16 Nov 165960.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
29 Sep 167273.7DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Melzi
Bishop Girolamo Melzi (born 1599, died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia

  • a priest for 13.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 741
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 34
  • obp/d: AT, 4 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jan 2017