Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Oddi

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 May 1655AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Mar 1656AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
12 Mar 1656Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
23 Jun 1659AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
23 Jun 1659ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
24 Feb 1668DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Oddi (VIAF: 136792768)
Bishop Marcantonio Oddi (died ) Bishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Caterina da Siena in via Giulia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 277, and Page 203
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 27
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2+: AT, 27 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast