Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Martinozzi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹Born
17 Aug 162516.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Oct 165647.7AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
5 Nov 165647.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
Aug 1663³54.5DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Martinozzi
Bishop Lorenzo Martinozzi O.S.B. (born 1609, died Aug 1663) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienne, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopSant’Ambrogio della Massima, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMontalcino, Diocese of Montalcino
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Montalcino, Diocese of Montalcino

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 37
  • ob/c2+: AT, 13 Nov 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,908

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast