Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Vianoli

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1656AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
2 Jul 1656Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
18 Dec 1673AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
Nov 1691³DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Vianoli
Bishop Giacomo Vianoli (died Nov 1691) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Marco, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)San Francesco della Vigna, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 383, and Page 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,656, Number 33
  • ob/c2: AT, 10 Nov 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,905

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast