Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostino Franciotti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Trapezus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
4 May 165424.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
10 May 165424.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
10 Jul 166636.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
Feb 1670³40.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Franciotti (VIAF: 286190503)
Archbishop Agostino Franciotti (born 1630, died Feb 1670) Apostolic Nuncio of Germany

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGes¨, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAachen

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 342
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1654, Number 36
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 244
  • b: Treccani.it, 6 Nov 2016
  • ob/c2: AT, 7 Nov 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018