Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio d’Amico

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1662AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
6 Aug 1662Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
15 Dec 1666AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
15 Dec 1668³DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio d’Amico:
Bishop Ignazio d’Amico (died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 123, Number 753
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 270, and Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013