Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement VII

Giulio de’ Medici

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1478Born
9 May 151334.9AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
23 Sep 151335.3Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 151335.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
21 Nov 151335.4AppointedBishop of Albi, France
17 Dec 151335.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
151536.5ResignedBishop of Albi, France
14 Feb 151536.7AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
18 Feb 151738.7AppointedAdministrator of Bitonto, Italy
27 Feb 151738.7ResignedAdministrator of Bitonto, Italy
26 Jun 151739.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
6 Jul 151739.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
19 Nov 151739.4AppointedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
19 Dec 151739.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 151739.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
8 Jan 151839.6AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
3 Mar 151839.7ResignedBishop of Bologna, Italy
5 May 151839.9ResignedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
5 Jul 151840.1AppointedAdministrator of Embrun, France
30 Jul 151840.1AppointedAdministrator of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
3 Sep 151840.2ResignedAdministrator of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
12 Sep 152042.2AppointedAdministrator of Eger, Hungary
7 Jun 152143.0AppointedAdministrator of Worcester, England, Great Britain
26 Sep 152244.3ResignedAdministrator of Worcester, England, Great Britain
18 Jun 152345.0ResignedAdministrator of Eger, Hungary
19 Nov 152345.4ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
26 Nov 152345.5InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 Sep 153456.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Giulio de’ Medici (VIAF: 90633828)
Pope Giulio de’ Medici (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 16.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Sep 1513
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 190, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 101, and Page 334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 98, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 119
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 62
  • b: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1517, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast