Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco de los 聲geles (Enrique) Cardinal Qui隳nes, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Former Administrator of Acerno

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1475²BornLe鏮, Spain
7 Dec 152752.9Elevated to Cardinal
25 Sep 152853.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
5 Dec 153055.9AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
21 Dec 153157.0Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
1532²57.0ResignedBishop of Coria, Spain
9 Jun 153964.4AppointedAdministrator of Acerno, Italy
29 Oct 153964.8ResignedAdministrator of Acerno, Italy
5 Nov 154065.8DiedFormer Administrator of Acerno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de los 聲geles (Enrique) Qui隳nes:
Cardinal Francisco de los 聲geles (Enrique) Qui隳nes O.F.M. (died ) Former Administrator of Acerno

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
  • a cardinal for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Dec 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa隳l, Volume 1500, Page 42, Number 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013