Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria Cardinal Ciocchi del Monte

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1461BornMonte S. Savino
4 Aug 150342.6AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
4 Jan 150645.0Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
6 Feb 150645.1AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
10 Mar 151150.2Elevated to Cardinal
13 Mar 151150.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
30 May 151150.4AppointedAdministrator of Pavia, Italy
14 Jul 151453.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
19 Apr 151655.3AppointedAdministrator of Novara, Italy
13 Mar 152160.2ResignedAdministrator of Pavia, Italy
24 Jul 152160.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
9 Dec 152362.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
18 Dec 152363.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
20 May 152463.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
15 Jun 152463.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
20 Dec 152565.0ResignedAdministrator of Novara, Italy
7 Apr 152968.3AppointedAdministrator of Rimini, Italy
24 May 152968.4AppointedAdministrator of Caiazzo, Italy
18 Jun 152968.5ResignedAdministrator of Caiazzo, Italy
4 Feb 153069.1AppointedAdministrator of Alatri, Italy
1 Jul 153069.5ResignedAdministrator of Alatri, Italy
20 Sep 153372.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Ciocchi del Monte:
Antonio Maria Cardinal Ciocchi del Monte (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
  • a cardinal for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 260, and Page 269
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 118, and Page 300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 168
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Aug 2014