Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Julius III

Giovanni Maria Ciocchi del Monte

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1487BornRome
18 Mar 151325.5AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
12 Nov 151427.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
13 Mar 152133.5AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
3 Jun 153042.7ResignedBishop of Pavia, Italy
22 Dec 153649.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 153749.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
11 Oct 154255.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
5 Oct 154356.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
4 Jun 154456.7AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
25 Jun 154456.7ResignedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
7 Feb 155062.4ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Feb 155062.4InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
23 Mar 155567.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Ciocchi del Monte:
Pope Giovanni Maria Ciocchi del Monte (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 40.3 years
  • a cardinal for 13.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 300
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,801

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014