Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Angelo Arcimboldi

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1485Born
2 Mar 152640.4AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
22 May 152640.6Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
19 Mar 155064.4AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
6 Apr 155569.5DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Angelo Arcimboldi (VIAF: 52502398)
Archbishop Giovanni Angelo Arcimboldi (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSte Praxede, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 260, and Page 240
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Oct 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,526, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast