Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sebastiano Antonio Cardinal Pighini

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1500BornArceto
27 Aug 154645.9AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
21 Dec 154646.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
4 Jun 154847.7AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
30 May 155049.7AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
20 Nov 155151.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 May 155251.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 155251.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
23 Nov 155353.2DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Antonio Pighini:
Cardinal Sebastiano Antonio Pighini (born , died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 95, and Page 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 104
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013