Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giannotto Pucci

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Mar 1528AppointedBishop of Melfi, Italy
16 May 1528AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
30 Nov 1531Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
1537²DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giannotto Pucci
Bishop Giannotto Pucci (died 1537) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016