Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Perugia-CittÓ della Pieve

Archidioecesis Perusinus-Civitatis Plebis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gualtiero Bassetti, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Paolo Giulietti, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Giuseppe Chiaretti, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,900 (733 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Umbria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.perugia.it/
  • Mailing Address: Piazza IV Novembre 6, 06123 Perugia, Italia
  • Telephone: 075.573.16.85
  • Fax: 075.573.26.72

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Perugia
2nd CenturyErectedDiocese of Perugia (erected)
Archdiocese of Perugia
27 March 1882ElevatedDiocese of Perugia Archdiocese of Perugia
15 August 1972ElevatedArchdiocese of Perugia (became a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Perugia-CittÓ della Pieve
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of CittÓ della Pieve
Archdiocese of Perugia
Archdiocese of Perugia-CittÓ della Pieve

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Perugia
1950166,036166,036100.0%2296529456480465193ap1951
1970185,000187,14498.9%217112329562123596201ap1971
1980187,600189,80098.8%200932936401102428205ap1981
Archdiocese of Perugia-CittÓ della Pieve
1990228,600230,80099.0%196842808161127521155ap1991
1999229,500232,50098.7%155782339847120450154ap2000
2000229,500232,50098.7%154812359767119399154ap2001
2001229,500232,50098.7%1498123099710119399154ap2002
2002229,500232,50098.7%149922419528130399154ap2003
2003229,500232,86298.6%1518323498011113399154ap2004
2004229,500232,50098.7%146812271,01112111399154ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Jun 2014