Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Salvi

Auxiliary Bishop of Perugia-Città della Pieve, Italy

Titular Bishop of Termae Himerae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1954 Born
28 May 198329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
30 Sep 198632.4IncardinatedPriest of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
15 Feb 201964.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perugia-Città della Pieve, Italy
15 Feb 201964.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Termae Himerae
31 Mar 201964.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Termae Himerae

MicroData Summary for Marco Salvi
Bishop Marco Salvi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Perugia-Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSansepolcro, Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)
Ordained PriestCathedral, Sansepolcro, Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Arezzo, Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Perugia-Città della Pieve.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2019
  • ob: CB, 15 Feb 2019
  • c2+: CB, 27 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Apr 2019

Quantcast