Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Coccopalmerio

President of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giuseppe dei Falegnami


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1938 BornSan Giuliano Milanese
28 Jun 196224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Apr 199355.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Apr 199355.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Coeliana
22 May 199355.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coeliana
15 Feb 200768.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
15 Feb 200768.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Coeliana
18 Feb 201273.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201273.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giuseppe dei Falegnami
26 Apr 201274.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giuseppe dei Falegnami
28 Feb 201375.0CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
16 Mar 201375.0ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts

MicroData Summary for Francesco Coccopalmerio:
Cardinal Francesco Coccopalmerio (born ) President of Legislative Texts

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,111
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,156
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1g29: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 24 Sep 2013