Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Frans Daneels, O. Praem.

Secretary of the Apostolic Signatura

Titular Archbishop of Bita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1941 BornKapellen, Belgium
26 Mar 196625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
12 Apr 200867.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bita
12 Apr 200867.0AppointedSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura
1 May 200867.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bita
10 Oct 201271.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bita

MicroData Summary for Frans Daneels:
Archbishop Frans Daneels O. Praem. (born ) Secretary of Apostolic Signatura

Please contact the Archbishop through the Apostolic Signatura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,734
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013