Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tarcisio Pietro Evasio Cardinal Bertone, S.D.B.

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1934 BornRomano Canavese
3 Dec 195016.0ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Jul 196025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Jun 199156.5AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
1 Aug 199156.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
13 Jun 199560.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
10 Dec 200268.0AppointedArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
2 Feb 200368.1InstalledArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
21 Oct 200368.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200368.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
24 Mar 200469.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
29 Aug 200671.7ResignedArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
15 Sep 200671.7AppointedSecretary of State
4 Apr 200772.3AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
10 May 200873.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
3 Oct 200974.8InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
28 Feb 201378.2CeasedSecretary of State
16 Mar 201378.2ConfirmedSecretary of State
15 Oct 201378.8RetiredSecretary of State
20 Dec 201480.0RetiredChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

MicroData Summary for Tarcisio Pietro Evasio Bertone: VIAF:88563699
Tarcisio Pietro Evasio Cardinal Bertone S.D.B. (born ) Secretary Emeritus of State

Please contact the Cardinal through the Secretariat of State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2008
  • i: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,459
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 20 Dec 2014