Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Caputo

Prelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy

Apostolic Administrator of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1950 Born
10 Apr 197423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
3 Sep 200756.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Otriculum
3 Sep 200756.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
3 Sep 200756.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Libya
29 Sep 200756.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Otriculum
10 Nov 201262.0AppointedPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
21 Nov 201262.0InstalledPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
5 Oct 202069.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Caputo
Archbishop Tommaso Caputo (born ) Prelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAfragola, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Territorial Prelature of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,526
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2012
  • i: AM, 26 Oct 2019
  • ab: CB, 7 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Oct 2020

Quantcast