Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Clément Marie Gérard Joseph Françoise Georges Laffitte, Comm. l'Emm.

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Family

Titular Bishop of Entrevaux

Titular See: (Prelate/Order of Malta)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1952 BornOloron-Sainte-Marie, France
2 Jul 198937.1Ordained PriestPriest of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
22 Oct 200957.4AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family
22 Oct 200957.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Entrevaux
12 Dec 200957.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Entrevaux
1 Sep 201664.3CeasedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family

MicroData Summary for Jean Clément Marie Gérard Joseph Françoise Georges Laffitte (VIAF: 85465748)
Bishop Jean Clément Marie Gérard Joseph Françoise Georges Laffitte Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Family

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for the Family.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Aug 2016