Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Renato Raffaele Cardinal Martino

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace

Cardinal-Deacon of San Francesco di Paola ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1932 BornSalerno, Italy
20 Jun 195724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy
14 Sep 198047.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Segermes
14 Sep 198047.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Thailand
14 Sep 198047.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Singapore
14 Sep 198047.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos
14 Sep 198047.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia
14 Dec 198048.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Segermes
198350.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam
3 Dec 198654.0AppointedOfficial to United Nations
1 Oct 200269.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
21 Oct 200370.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Francesco di Paola ai Monti
21 Oct 200370.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Apr 200572.4CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
21 Apr 200572.4ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
11 Mar 200673.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
28 Feb 200976.3RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
24 Oct 200976.9RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace

MicroData Summary for Renato Raffaele Martino:
Renato Raffaele Cardinal Martino (born ) President Emeritus of Justice and Peace

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2009
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014