Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Delegation to Laos



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Tschang In-Nam, Apostolic Delegate

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Laos, Malaysia and Singapore
25 April 1969SplitDelegation to Thailand, Laos, Malaysia and Singapore Delegation to Laos, Malaysia and Singapore
Nunciature to Thailand
Delegation to Laos and Malaysia
24 June 1981SplitDelegation to Laos, Malaysia and Singapore Delegation to Laos and Malaysia
Delegation to Singapore
7 December 1983SplitDelegation to Laos and Malaysia Delegation to Malaysia and Brunei
Delegation to Laos
Delegation to Laos
7 December 1983SplitDelegation to Laos and Malaysia Delegation to Malaysia and Brunei
Delegation to Laos

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.7, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Mar 2019

Quantcast