Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Bryan Wells

Apostolic Nuncio to South Africa

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis

Apostolic Nuncio to Botswana

Apostolic Nuncio to Lesotho

Apostolic Nuncio to Namibia

Apostolic Nuncio to Swaziland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1963 BornTulsa, OK
12 Jul 199128.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
9 Feb 201652.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
9 Feb 201652.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Africa
9 Feb 201652.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Botswana
13 Feb 201652.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lesotho
13 Feb 201652.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Namibia
19 Mar 201652.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
13 Jun 201653.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Swaziland

MicroData Summary for Peter Bryan Wells
Archbishop Peter Bryan Wells (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of South Africa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to South Africa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Feb 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2016
  • c3+: CB, 19 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,869
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jun 2016