Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fernando Cardinal Filoni

Prefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

Cardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora di Coromoto in San Giovanni di Dio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1946 BornManduria, Italy
3 Jul 197024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nardň, Italy
17 Jan 200154.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Volturnum
17 Jan 200154.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iraq
17 Jan 200154.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jordan
19 Mar 200154.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Volturnum
25 Feb 200659.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
9 Jun 200761.2AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
10 May 201165.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
18 Feb 201265.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora di Coromoto in San Giovanni di Dio
18 Feb 201265.8Elevated to Cardinal
26 Feb 201265.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora di Coromoto in San Giovanni di Dio
28 Feb 201366.9CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
16 Mar 201366.9ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

MicroData Summary for Fernando Filoni:
Fernando Cardinal Filoni (born ) Prefect of Evangelization of Peoples

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2011
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1n02: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,934
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014