Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dennis Kofi Agbenyadzi, S.M.A.

Bishop of Berbérati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1964 BornKadjebi-Akan, Ghana
29 Jun 199631.7Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Society of African Missions
12 Jul 199732.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
14 May 201247.6AppointedBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic
22 Jul 201247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Dennis Kofi Agbenyadzi:
Bishop Dennis Kofi Agbenyadzi S.M.A. (born ) Bishop of Berbérati

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Berbérati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2012
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,505

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013