Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Mathos

Deceased

Bishop of Bambari, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1948Born
19 Jun 197728.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
28 Aug 198739.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
28 Aug 198739.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi
10 Jan 198839.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi
26 Jan 199142.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
6 Nov 200456.3AppointedBishop of Bambari, Central African Republic
28 Apr 201768.8DiedBishop of Bambari, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Edouard Mathos
Bishop Edouard Mathos (born , died ) Bishop of Bambari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBossangoa
Death PlaceBangui, Archdiocese of Bangui

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,431
  • d: CB, 28 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Apr 2017